Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sayer, Brian, Sayer , Brian G, against Mcdannels , Andrew P., Scottish Ventures, Llc., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Response | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Administrative Transfer | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Questionnaire Due | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.