Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Banda, Amayrani, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alexander, Josh W., against Brison, Jt, represented by Mumm, Matthew R., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2 with Woodward, Stephani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Stephani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Order | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Questionairre | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Reinstating | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.