Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Longfellow, Todd, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Longfellow, Janis Heather, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Granting NonSuit | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of NonSuit | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter-Claim | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.