Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bunrside, Brandon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Burnside, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation Notice | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation Notice | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter-Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.