Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Poynter, John Cristopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodriguez, Yokabel, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Decree of Divorce | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Employers Order to Withold Income | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Kids First Program | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation Notice | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.