Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
On Deck Capital, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lansden, Tyler G, against Burke, Scott, represented by Holt, Charles, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2 with Woodward, Stephani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Stephani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Questionairre | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.