Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rivers, Keith A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rivers, Nancy Ann, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Undelivered Mail | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.