Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Combs, Amanda R., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Combs, Derrick R., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.