Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Td Auto Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Addison, Brandi Marie, against Simons, Collin G, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2 with Woodward, Stephani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Stephani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | 239A Letter Sent | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.