Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cody, Candance, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Strann, Michael Ray, represented by Godoy, Jon A., Schneider, Catherine, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance Filing | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation Lead Counsel | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.