Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Mayfield, Storie Marie, Mayfield, Kaleb Reis, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2009 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 549115 Vol./Book 549115 |
|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation MAYFIELD, KALEB REIS Served 03/13/2009 | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation MAYFIELD, STORIE MARIE Served 03/05/2009 | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | File | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.