Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sullivan, Gary, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brett Turnbull, against Hernandez, Victor, A-1 Building Supply, Llc, represented by Robert L. Craig, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - 3/3/2022 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY - 3/3/2022 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN - 5 PAGES SIGNED ON 10-22-21 LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN - 5 PAGES SIGNED ON 10-22-21 |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER - ATTY ROBERT CRAIG DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER - ATTY ROBERT CRAIG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.