Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Miranda, Nallely Stephanie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Castillo, Ivan Miranda, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S BRIEF |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
BRIEF RESPONDENT'S RESPONDENT'S |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
BRIEF PETITIONER'S PETITIONER'S |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST PETITIONER'S PETITIONER'S |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) IN POTTER COUNTY IN POTTER COUNTY |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION NALLELY MIRANDA NALLELY MIRANDA |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ATTY BLAIR OSCARSSON ATTY BLAIR OSCARSSON |
|
July 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED FIRST AMENDED COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
July 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ATTY JAMES ABBOTT ATTY JAMES ABBOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.