Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herd, Gina, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Preston J Dugas, Iii, against Western World Insurance Group, represented by Robert G. Hogue, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL (TO US DISTRICT COURT) | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE GROUP FOR WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE GROUP |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ATTY ROBERT HOGUE ATTY ROBERT HOGUE |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED WESTERN WORLD - 4/28/2021 - $145.00 PROCESS SERVER WESTERN WORLD - 4/28/2021 - $145.00 PROCESS SERVER |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE GROUP - EFILED TO ATTY WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE GROUP - EFILED TO ATTY |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.