Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Donald D Degrasse, against Habel, Cynthia A., Lebah Inc, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryAccounts, Notes, And Contracts |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) SIGNED 7/23/2021 - 2 PGS SIGNED 7/23/2021 - 2 PGS |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO CYNTHIA - MAILED TO CYNTHIA - MAILED |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO LEBAH, INC. - MAILED TO LEBAH, INC. - MAILED |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO ATTY - EFILED TO ATTY - EFILED |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED JUDGEMENT - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED JUDGEMENT - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED CYNTHIA HABEL - 4/1/2021 - $80.00 PROCESS SERVER CYNTHIA HABEL - 4/1/2021 - $80.00 PROCESS SERVER |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED LEBAH INC - 4/1/2021 - $80.00 PROCESS SERVER LEBAH INC - 4/1/2021 - $80.00 PROCESS SERVER |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED CYNTHIA HABEL - EFILED TO ATTY CYNTHIA HABEL - EFILED TO ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.