Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hiw, Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jeremi Young, against Cantu, Robert J., Cantu, Robert, Cantu, Emma, represented by John Thomas Boyd, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ROBERT CANTU/TOM BOYD ROBERT CANTU/TOM BOYD |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED ROBERT CANTU SR - EFILED TO ATTY ROBERT CANTU SR - EFILED TO ATTY |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DEFENDANTS EMMMA AND ROBERT CANTU / TOM BOYD DEFENDANTS EMMMA AND ROBERT CANTU / TOM BOYD |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM JUDGE TO COUNSEL - LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN TO COUNSEL - LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED *RE-ISSUED DUE TO CLERK ERROR* -ROBERT CANTU - EFILED BACK TO sabrina@youngfirm.com FOR SERVICE *RE-ISSUED DUE TO CLERK ERROR* -ROBERT CANTU - EFILED BACK TO sabrina@youngfirm.com FOR SERVICE |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.