Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Russell, Brittany, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kevin B. Miller, against Allstate Insurance Company, represented by Shawn David Twing, Terah Moxley, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM/OPINION FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S RECORD | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S RECORD FOR CLERK'S RECORD |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS - 07-21-00046-CV FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS - 07-21-00046-CV |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT REPORTER TO COURT REPORTER |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL BROUGHT BY BRITTANY RUSSELL BROUGHT BY BRITTANY RUSSELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.