Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Montano, Ashlee Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Montano, Isaac, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) FINAL- 4 PAGES SIGNED ON 6-15-21 FINAL- 4 PAGES SIGNED ON 6-15-21 |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE MAILED TO ISAAC AND ASHEE MONTANO MAILED TO ISAAC AND ASHEE MONTANO |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED ISAAC MONTANO III - WAITING ON SERVICE DATE FROM PORTALES SO ISAAC MONTANO III - WAITING ON SERVICE DATE FROM PORTALES SO |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED ISAAC MONTANO - GIVEN TO PETITIONER FOR SERVICE OUT OF COUNTY ISAAC MONTANO - GIVEN TO PETITIONER FOR SERVICE OUT OF COUNTY |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED ISAAC MONTANO - GIVEN TO PETITIONER FOR SERVICE OUT OF COUNTY ISAAC MONTANO - GIVEN TO PETITIONER FOR SERVICE OUT OF COUNTY |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.