Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Allen, Angela Carol, Allen, Michael Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Drake, Caitlyn Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SUITE AFFECTING PARENT/CHILD RELATIONSHIP (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LET/RETURNED REGARDING DISMISSAL DOCKET - RETURN TO SENDER - UNABLE TO FORWARD REGARDING DISMISSAL DOCKET - RETURN TO SENDER - UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP - 15 PAGES SIGNED ON 9-23-21 AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP - 15 PAGES SIGNED ON 9-23-21 |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF THE AGREED ORDER FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF THE AGREED ORDER |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER DO NOT USE THIS ORDER DUE TO PAGE MISSING - AGREED TEMPORARY ORDEERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP DO NOT USE THIS ORDER DUE TO PAGE MISSING - AGREED TEMPORARY ORDEERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner and attorney Bill Taylor appeared via zoon. Respondent appeared via zoom pro se. Respondent - sworn and testified. Announced agreement. Waiting on agreed order. Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner and attorney Bill Taylor appeared via zoon. Respondent appeared via zoom pro se. Respondent - sworn and testified. Announced agreement. Waiting on agreed order. |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO SERVED/UNSERVED SERVED - CAITLYN DRAKE ON 2-25-21 SERVED - CAITLYN DRAKE ON 2-25-21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.