Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schoenrock, Matthew Brian, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schoenrock, Faith Estrada, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) FINAL - 8 PAGES SIGNED ON 5-26-21 FINAL - 8 PAGES SIGNED ON 5-26-21 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED FAITH ESTRADA SCHOENROCK ON 3-1-21 FAITH ESTRADA SCHOENROCK ON 3-1-21 |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FAITH ESTRADA SCHOENROCK (PRO SE) FAITH ESTRADA SCHOENROCK (PRO SE) |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED FAITH ESTRADA SHOENROCK - SENT WITH PETITIONER TO PAMPA TX FAITH ESTRADA SHOENROCK - SENT WITH PETITIONER TO PAMPA TX |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FOR PROVE-UP OF DEFAULT DIVORCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FOR PROVE-UP OF DEFAULT DIVORCE WITHOUT CHILDREN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.