Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
O'Banion, Brandon Shea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against O'Banion, Alexase Cree, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA SERVED BAILEY PFEIFF BAILEY PFEIFF |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS - BROUGHT BY BRANDON SHEA O'BANION MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS - BROUGHT BY BRANDON SHEA O'BANION |
|
June 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER BRANDON O'BANION - PRO SE BRANDON O'BANION - PRO SE |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS - JULY 1, 2021 AT 11:00 AM VIA ZOOM ON MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS - JULY 1, 2021 AT 11:00 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING JULY 28, 2021 AT 1:30 PM JULY 28, 2021 AT 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.