Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lopez, Cody Draven, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Broyles, Rian Briann, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PROPOSED FINAL ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PROPOSED FINAL ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM THE SDU - SDU CAUSE # 0014138947 FROM THE SDU - SDU CAUSE # 0014138947 |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - 15 PAGES SIGNED ON 2-16-21 SENT TO THE SDU IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - 15 PAGES SIGNED ON 2-16-21 SENT TO THE SDU |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney George Harwood appeared via zoom. Respondent did not appear. Opening statement. Petitioner called Cody Lopez - sworn and testified. F= sole managing conservator. M = c/s =$200.00 /month. Supervised visitation. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney George Harwood appeared via zoom. Respondent did not appear. Opening statement. Petitioner called Cody Lopez - sworn and testified. F= sole managing conservator. M = c/s =$200.00 /month. Supervised visitation. |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED RIAN BRIANN BROYLES ON 1-8-21 RIAN BRIANN BROYLES ON 1-8-21 |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - 2 PAGES SIGNED ON 1-6-21 FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - 2 PAGES SIGNED ON 1-6-21 |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED RIAN BRIANN BROYLES - E-FILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE RIAN BRIANN BROYLES - E-FILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.