Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Paxton, Danny Joe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Palacios-Paxton, Isela Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R. Petitioner and attorney Cody Pirtle appeared. Ad litem - Donna Christie appeared. Petitioner called Danny Paxton - sworn and testified. - No children. Divorce granted. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. Petitioner and attorney Cody Pirtle appeared. Ad litem - Donna Christie appeared. Petitioner called Danny Paxton - sworn and testified. - No children. Divorce granted. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF DUE DILIGENCE BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR RESPONDENT CITED BY PUBLICATION OF DUE DILIGENCE BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR RESPONDENT CITED BY PUBLICATION |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER FILED BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR RESPONDENT CITED BY PUBLICATION - FILED BY ATTORNEY DONNA CHRISTIE ORIGINAL ANSWER FILED BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR RESPONDENT CITED BY PUBLICATION - FILED BY ATTORNEY DONNA CHRISTIE |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AFTER CITATION BY PUBLICATION - 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 3-30-21 OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AFTER CITATION BY PUBLICATION - 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 3-30-21 |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AFTER CITATION BY PUBLICATION - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AFTER CITATION BY PUBLICATION - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) **NEED TO GET AD LITEM** **NEED TO GET AD LITEM** |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT STATEMENT OF FACTS BY AFFIDAVIT OF CODY M. PIRTLE, ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER, DANNY JOE PAXTON STATEMENT OF FACTS BY AFFIDAVIT OF CODY M. PIRTLE, ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER, DANNY JOE PAXTON |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.