Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vanover, Tara, Vanover, Brazz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frederic Wolfram, against Trent Kincanon Dba Golden Spread Septic, Kincanon, Bobby, Kincanon Homes, Llc, represented by Pro Se, Earl Griffin, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER OF SEVERANCE - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER OF SEVERANCE - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion or Request for Severance | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL BRIEF POST POST |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Case called; plaintiffs appeared with counsel and announced ready; defendants appeared pro se and announced ready; testimony and evidence received from Plaintiffs and Defendants; case taken under advisement. Case called; plaintiffs appeared with counsel and announced ready; defendants appeared pro se and announced ready; testimony and evidence received from Plaintiffs and Defendants; case taken under advisement. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF SCOTTCO MECHANICAL - UNSWORN OF SCOTTCO MECHANICAL - UNSWORN |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER PERMITTING WITNESS TO APPEAR BY ZOOM - JULY 27, 2022 BY ZOOM PERMITTING WITNESS TO APPEAR BY ZOOM - JULY 27, 2022 BY ZOOM |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WITNESS TO APPEAR BY ZOOM FOR WITNESS TO APPEAR BY ZOOM |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PERMITTING WITNESS TO APPEAR BY ZOOM - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PERMITTING WITNESS TO APPEAR BY ZOOM - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING JULY 27, 2022 AT 1:30 PM JULY 27, 2022 AT 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.