Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pierce, Brandon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pierce, Gabrielle, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SUITE AFFECTING PARENT/CHILD RELATIONSHIP (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Santiago Balderrama appeared via zoom. Respondent appeared pro se via zoom. Petitioner called Tomas Solano - sworn and testified. Petitioner called Brandon Pierce - sworn and testified. Petitioner rested. Respondent called --- - sworn and testified. Respondent rested. Both sides closed and argued. Temp orders - JMC F=PR. M=SPO. c/s = 0 mother reimburse medical support. Waiting on order. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Santiago Balderrama appeared via zoom. Respondent appeared pro se via zoom. Petitioner called Tomas Solano - sworn and testified. Petitioner called Brandon Pierce - sworn and testified. Petitioner rested. Respondent called --- - sworn and testified. Respondent rested. Both sides closed and argued. Temp orders - JMC F=PR. M=SPO. c/s = 0 mother reimburse medical support. Waiting on order. |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry 2/2/21 Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Santiago Balderrama appeared via zoom. Respondent appeared pro se (from Randall County Jail). Petitioner called Gabrielle Pierce - sworn and testified. 2/2/21 Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Santiago Balderrama appeared via zoom. Respondent appeared pro se (from Randall County Jail). Petitioner called Gabrielle Pierce - sworn and testified. |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA SERVED TOM SALANO CPS ON 3-4-21 TOM SALANO CPS ON 3-4-21 |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) 01/12/2021 Reset by Court to 02/02/2021 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO SERVED/UNSERVED SERVED - GABRIELLE PIERCE ON 1-12-21 SERVED - GABRIELLE PIERCE ON 1-12-21 |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Service Type TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - FAMILY PIERCE, GABRIELLE Served 01/12/2021 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - FAMILY |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SERVED GABRIELLE PIERCE - REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL GABRIELLE PIERCE - REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED GABRIELLE PIERCE ON 1-7-21 GABRIELLE PIERCE ON 1-7-21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.