Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fna 2019-1, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by J. Lindsey Rusler, against Randall County, Amarillo Junior College, Canyon Isd, City Of Amarillo And Randall Hi-Plains Wa, Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott, Llp, Martinez, Priscilla, represented by William C. Pinkham, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Other Service Type MARTINEZ, PRISCILLA Unserved | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUED ORDER OF SALE PRISCILLA MARTINEZ - RCSO PRISCILLA MARTINEZ - RCSO |
|
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to issue Order of Sale REQUEST Request to issue Order of Sale |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES - EMAILED TO Angela@srbslaw.com FOR COPIES - EMAILED TO Angela@srbslaw |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO PRISCILLA MARTINEZ TO PRISCILLA MARTINEZ |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE EFILED TO ATTYS EFILED TO ATTYS |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT (OCA) 6 PGS - SIGNED ON 1/6/2021 6 PGS - SIGNED ON 1/6/2021 |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.