Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Siebrecht, Justin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ed Mcconnell, , against Sanders, Leah, Sanders, Hunter, Sanders, Heath, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Bruce S. Campbell, Patrick A Bowser, , in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | FRIENDLY SUIT (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Plaintiff and attorney Ed McConnell appeared via zoom. Defendant attorney Bruce Campbell appeared via zoom. Defendant attorney Patrick Bowser appeared via zoom. Ad litem - Kevin Isern appeared via zoom. Plaintiff called Justin Siebrecht - sworn and testified. Settlement approved. Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Plaintiff and attorney Ed McConnell appeared via zoom. Defendant attorney Bruce Campbell appeared via zoom. Defendant attorney Patrick Bowser appeared via zoom. Ad litem - Kevin Isern appeared via zoom. Plaintiff called Justin Siebrecht - sworn and testified. Settlement approved. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) ***SET FOR ZOOM HEARING*** ***SET FOR ZOOM HEARING*** |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT TESTIMONY BY AFFIDAVIT TESTIMONY BY AFFIDAVIT |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER - FILED BY ATTORNEY PATRICK A. BOWSER DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER - FILED BY ATTORNEY PATRICK A. BOWSER |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ATTORNEY KEVIN ISERN APPOINTED FOR MINOR ATTORNEY KEVIN ISERN APPOINTED FOR MINOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.