Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Edgar Quijada, against Soto, Jazmine, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryAccounts, Notes, And Contracts |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAUTL JUDGMENT (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) **PLEASE SUBMIT A NEW AFFIDAVIT IDENTIFYING THE DEFENDANT BY NAME IN THE BODY OF THE AFFIDAVIT** **PLEASE SUBMIT A NEW AFFIDAVIT IDENTIFYING THE DEFENDANT BY NAME IN THE BODY OF THE AFFIDAVIT** |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED JAZMINE SOTO 7-22-20 JAZMINE SOTO 7-22-20 |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES FOR COPIES |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING RULE 106 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS - 2 PAGES SIGNED ON 6-22-2020 GRANTING RULE 106 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS - 2 PAGES SIGNED ON 6-22-2020 |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED GRANTING RULE 106 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED GRANTING RULE 106 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA'S RULE 106 MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTUED SERVICE PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA'S RULE 106 MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTUED SERVICE |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.