Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
J.G. Wentworth Origination, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Julie Pi Evans, against **Confidential**, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED Order to Unseal - SENT TO JUDGE SCHAAP PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED Order to Unseal - SENT TO JUDGE SCHAAP |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Unseal MOTION Motion to Unseal |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Structured Settlement (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Structured Settlement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Schaap, Dan L) | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE MAILED TO ATTORNEY MAILED TO ATTORNEY |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER (OCA) APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMSN RIGHTS 2-27-2020 3 PGS APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMSN RIGHTS 2-27-2020 3 PGS |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED 2-27-2020 @ 11:00 AM AMENDED 2-27-2020 @ 11:00 AM |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2-24-20 @ 9:00 AM 2-24-20 @ 9:00 AM |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.