Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson, Linda Diane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Starlin, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PAYEE | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO LINDA AND STARLIN JOHNSON TO LINDA AND STARLIN JOHNSON |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - AGREED (OCA) 22 PAGES SIGNED ON 12-12-19 SENT TO THE SDU 22 PAGES SIGNED ON 12-12-19 SENT TO THE SDU |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE - STARLIN JR. JOHNSON - STARLIN JR. JOHNSON |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | PRO SE ADVISEMENT AND INFO (of party filing) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.