Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Esparza, Gaylynn filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryBond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO CONNIE MAE WEBSTER TO CONNIE MAE WEBSTER |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) 1 PG - SIGNED ON 7/15/2020 1 PG - SIGNED ON 7/15/2020 |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO GAYLYNN ESPARZA TO GAYLYNN ESPARZA |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 7/16/2020 AT 9:30 AM FOR 7/16/2020 AT 9:30 AM |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 7/16/2020 AT 9:30 AM FOR 7/16/2020 AT 9:30 AM |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
GENERAL DENIAL GAYLYNN ESPARZA, DBA AKA GAYLYNN'S BAIL BONDS, SURETY GAYLYNN ESPARZA, DBA AKA GAYLYNN'S BAIL BONDS, SURETY |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED GAYLYNN ESPARZA - PICKED UP ON 10/8/2019 GAYLYNN ESPARZA - PICKED UP ON 10/8/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.