Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Karamyan, Vardan, Karamyan, Anna Kochanowska, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walter P. Wolfram, against Union Square Property Group, Inc., Bluehaven Homes, Llc, represented by Mark L. Mosley, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2019 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE REQUESTING TRIAL HEARING TO JUDGE REQUESTING TRIAL HEARING |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE - BY MARK MOSLEY AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE - BY MARK MOSLEY |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TO UNIONSQUARE PROPERTY GROUP IN C/O MARK MOSLEY ON 7-25-19 TO UNIONSQUARE PROPERTY GROUP IN C/O MARK MOSLEY ON 7-25-19 |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED BLUEHAVEN HOMES LLC, C/O MARK MOSLEY ON 7-25-19 BLUEHAVEN HOMES LLC, C/O MARK MOSLEY ON 7-25-19 |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO UNION SQUARE PROPERTY GROUP TO UNION SQUARE PROPERTY GROUP |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED BLUEHAVEN HOMES, LLC BLUEHAVEN HOMES, LLC |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.