Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ricoh Usa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ian A Mccarthy, against The Wesley Daniel Corporation, represented by John Thomas Boyd, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2019 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SIMMARY JUDG.-SUBMISSION (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF SUBMISSION |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - PLEASE SET FOR HEARING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - PLEASE SET FOR HEARING |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AMENDEDND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AMENDEDND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM ON NOVEMBER 30, 2020 @ 11:00 AM VIA ZOOM ON NOVEMBER 30, 2020 @ 11:00 AM |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDG.-ORAL (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) ***DID NOT SIGN*** ***DID NOT SIGN*** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.