Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laugesen, Lisbeth Elena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harmon, Martyn, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO LISBETH ELENA LAUGESEN AND MARTYN HARMON TO LISBETH ELENA LAUGESEN AND MARTYN HARMON |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - DEFAULT (OCA) SIGNED 8/21/19, 5 PGS SIGNED 8/21/19, 5 PGS |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner appeared pro se. Respondent did not appear and wholly made default. No children. Divorce granted. Interpreter - Marty Laugesen - sworn and interpreted. Decree signed. Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner appeared pro se. Respondent did not appear and wholly made default. No children. Divorce granted. Interpreter - Marty Laugesen - sworn and interpreted. Decree signed. |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED MARTYN, 6/19/19 MARTYN, 6/19/19 |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO MARTYN HARMON, SENT TO RCSO TO MARTYN HARMON, SENT TO RCSO |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation HARMON, MARTYN Served 06/19/2019 | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO PAY COSTS | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.