Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson, Shelbi Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Brent Alan, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - AGREED (OCA) SIGNED 04/14/2020 - 46 PGS - SENT TO SDU SIGNED 04/14/2020 - 46 PGS - SENT TO SDU |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO ATTYS - EFILED TO ATTYS - EFILED |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner and attorney Elizabeth Odle appeared. Respondent and attorney Wade Byrd appeared. Both parties sworn and testified. 2 children. JMC. modified SPO c/s = 655/mo. HI= F. Divorce granted. Waiting on decree. Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner and attorney Elizabeth Odle appeared. Respondent and attorney Wade Byrd appeared. Both parties sworn and testified. 2 children. JMC. modified SPO c/s = 655/mo. HI= F. Divorce granted. Waiting on decree. |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Anderson, James, Anderson, James) | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING FINAL HEARING ON 2-14-20 AT 9:00 AM FINAL HEARING ON 2-14-20 AT 9:00 AM |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED SETTING HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED SETTING HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
June 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE FOR DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.