Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ewers, Jared Ray, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ewers, Darcy Marie, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - AGREED (OCA) 50 PAGES SIGNED ON 8-26-2020 - SENT TO THE SDU 50 PAGES SIGNED ON 8-26-2020 - SENT TO THE SDU |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF INCOME WITHHOLDING 4 PAGES SIGNED ON 8-26-2020 4 PAGES SIGNED ON 8-26-2020 |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE OF FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED WRIT OF INCOME WITHHOLDING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED WRIT OF INCOME WITHHOLDING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO SET CONTESTED FINAL HEARING UNDER RULE 245, TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ORDER ON MOTION TO SET CONTESTED FINAL HEARING UNDER RULE 245, TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION JUDGE CONFER W/CHILD 2 PAGES SIGNED ON 6-4-2020 2 PAGES SIGNED ON 6-4-2020 |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO SET CONTESTED FINAL HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION TO SET CONTESTED FINAL HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.