Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Larkan, Whitney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by J. E. Sauseda, Chris Hoffman, against Miranda, Kailyn, represented by John W Stilwell, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER / VACATION SCHEDULE ATTY JOHN STILWELL ATTY JOHN STILWELL |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTY CHRIS HOFFMAN FOR WHITNEY LARKAN ATTY CHRIS HOFFMAN FOR WHITNEY LARKAN |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / VACATION SCHEDULE JOHN STILWELL 3/15-3/19/21; 6/28 - 7/2/21; 7/6 -8/6/21 JOHN STILWELL 3/15-3/19/21; 6/28 - 7/2/21; 7/6 -8/6/21 |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / VACATION SCHEDULE FOR JOHN STILWELL FOR JOHN STILWELL |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KAILYN MIRANDA - FILED BY JOHN STILWELL ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KAILYN MIRANDA - FILED BY JOHN STILWELL |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / VACATION SCHEDULE JOHN STILWELL JOHN STILWELL |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KAILYN MIRANDA - FILED BY JOHN STILWELL ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KAILYN MIRANDA - FILED BY JOHN STILWELL |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO KAILYN MIRANDA AND E-FILED BACK TO ATTY'S LEGAL ASST. TO KAILYN MIRANDA AND E-FILED BACK TO ATTY'S LEGAL ASST. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.