Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pineda, Julian Gonzales, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pineda, Andrea Marie, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT LETTER FROM FIDELITY LETTER FROM FIDELITY |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPIES OF QDRO - SENT TO ATTY ON 9-4-19 FOR CERTIFIED COPIES OF QDRO - SENT TO ATTY ON 9-4-19 |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SAVINGS PLAN EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SAVINGS PLAN |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER EMPLOYEE PENSION PLAN EMPLOYEE PENSION PLAN |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PAYEE | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF INCOME WITHHOLDING DID NOT PAY $15 AS OF YET DID NOT PAY $15 AS OF YET |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO ATTYS, EFILED TO ATTYS TO ATTYS, EFILED TO ATTYS |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - AGREED (OCA) 8-1-19 - 35 PGS 8-1-19 - 35 PGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.