Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Zaid, Tonya Gayle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zaid, Elmalki Salah, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO TONYA ZAID AND ELMALKI ZAID TO TONYA ZAID AND ELMALKI ZAID |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) SIGNED 4/10/2019, 8 PGS SIGNED 4/10/2019, 8 PGS |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SERVICE |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PRO SE ADVISEMENT AND INFO (of party filing) | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.