Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williams, Donna Loree, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, James Steven, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO J.D. SCHMIDT AND MICHAEL SHARPEE TO J.D. SCHMIDT AND MICHAEL SHARPEE |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) SIGNED 4/18/18, 11 PGS SIGNED 4/18/18, 11 PGS |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED DIVORCE-ATTY (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Debby Murphy, C.S.R.., Petitioner and attorney J. D. Schmidt appeared. Petitioner called Donna Williams - sworn and testified. no children. Divorce granted. Decree signed. Debby Murphy, C.S.R.., Petitioner and attorney J. D. Schmidt appeared. Petitioner called Donna Williams - sworn and testified. no children. Divorce granted. Decree signed. |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE, RE: MEDIATION AGREEMENT TO JUDGE, RE: MEDIATION AGREEMENT |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION SALLY EMERSON SALLY EMERSON |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER ON MEDIATION-SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER ON MEDIATION-SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.