Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Catalina Structured Funding Inc., Townsend, Charles, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Christopher R. Milton, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2017 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO CHRISTOPHER MILTON AND KENT RIES E-FILED TO CHRISTOPHER MILTON AND KENT RIES |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR 2 CERTIFIED COPIES-1 VIA E-FILE AND 1 MAILED-SENT 1-4-18 FOR 2 CERTIFIED COPIES-1 VIA E-FILE AND 1 MAILED-SENT 1-4-18 |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS SIGNED BY JUDGE BOARD 1-3-18 ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS SIGNED BY JUDGE BOARD 1-3-18 |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPR/TRANS STRUCTURED SETT/PAYMENTS AMENDED AMENDED |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS-AMENDED-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS-AMENDED-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Structured Settlement (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR APPORVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS 12-14-17 @ 9:30 AM ON SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR APPORVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS 12-14-17 @ 9:30 AM |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.