Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cooper, Janet, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Joe Marr Wilson, against Spencer, Barry Morris, Allen, Mary Lou, Allen, Frank Riley, represented by Lindsey Wachsmann Murray, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DISPUTE RESOLUTION CTR | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION SIGNED 8/1/17, 1 PG SIGNED 8/1/17, 1 PG |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION-SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION-SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ATTORNEY: LINDSEY MURRAY ATTORNEY: LINDSEY MURRAY |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TO BARRY SPENCER 6/9/17 TO BARRY SPENCER 6/9/17 |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED FRANK ALLEN 6/9/17 FRANK ALLEN 6/9/17 |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED MARY LOU ALLEN 6/9/17 MARY LOU ALLEN 6/9/17 |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE FOR ISSUANCE |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO MARY ALLEN-EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY TO MARY ALLEN-EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.