Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gallegos, Catherine Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gallegos, Jim Bob, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CATHERINE ROBERTSON RE: INTENT TO RELOCATE WITH CHILDREN FROM CATHERINE ROBERTSON RE: INTENT TO RELOCATE WITH CHILDREN |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS 6-9-17 @ 9:00 AM AND ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS 6-9-17 @ 9:00 AM |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED TRO AND ORDER SETTING HEARING-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED TRO AND ORDER SETTING HEARING-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.