Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kornoelje, Meika, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kornoelje, John Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT JOHN-DUE 3/7/19 JOHN-DUE 3/7/19 |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER AGREED ORDER-AG AGREED ORDER-AG |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed CSRO signed, JFowler Associate Judge Agreed CSRO signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PROPOSED CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER 2/14/19 PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PROPOSED CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER 2/14/19 |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Post-Judgment Actions - Title IV-D (OCA) | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT/S FILED EXHIBIT 1 EXHIBIT 1 |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO BRIDGET O'BRIEN E-FILED TO BRIDGET O'BRIEN |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE BOARD 6-7-18 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE BOARD 6-7-18 |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE JOHN KORNOELJE JOHN KORNOELJE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.