Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Michael J Garza, against Wetsel, Krystal, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryAccounts, Notes, And Contracts |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) ****ANSWER ON FILE. DID NOT SIGN**** ****ANSWER ON FILE. DID NOT SIGN**** |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLAINTIFF'S FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF'S FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TO KRYSTAL WETSEL-1/3/17 TO KRYSTAL WETSEL-1/3/17 |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO KRYSTAL WETSEL-EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY TO KRYSTAL WETSEL-EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE FOR ISSUANCE |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.