Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez, Aracely, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez, Adan Aranda, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PLACE OF PAYMENT | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO GEORGE HARWOOD AND MAILED TO ADAN PEREZ E-FILED TO GEORGE HARWOOD AND MAILED TO ADAN PEREZ |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) 5-11-17 31 pgs 5-11-17 31 pgs |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SERVICE |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.