Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randall County, Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Rea, Ronda Gail, Rea, David P, Nations Banc Mortgage Corporation, Johnston, Colby Tyler, Johnston, Christopher Todd, (total of 6) See All represented by Jeremi Young, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCUMENTS | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT (OCA) SIGNED 1/24/2020 1PG SIGNED 1/24/2020 1PG |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR NONSUIT | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FOR NON SUIT-placed in the judges queue PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FOR NON SUIT-placed in the judges queue |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED - David Rea served 10/29/19 in RIO RANCHO NM $25 - David Rea served 10/29/19 in RIO RANCHO NM $25 |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED - Christopher Todd Johnston served on 10/16/19 - GEARY COUNTY, JUNCTION CITY KANSAS $30 per Anne in Tax Office. - Christopher Todd Johnston served on 10/16/19 - GEARY COUNTY, JUNCTION CITY KANSAS $30 per Anne in Tax Office. |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED - DAVID REA - for service in Sandoval County, New Mexico - DAVID REA - for service in Sandoval County, New Mexico |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CITATION UNSERVED DAVID REA-rcso $90 DAVID REA-rcso $90 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.