Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randall County, Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Hall, Rashawnna, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE MAILED TO NEW ADDRESS ON RETURNED MAIL MAILED TO NEW ADDRESS ON RETURNED MAIL |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | TAX CASE (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT/S FILED 1 THUR 3 1 THUR 3 |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED RASHAWNNA HALL 6.22.17 -- RCSO $75 RASHAWNNA HALL 6.22.17 -- RCSO $75 |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED -- SENT TO 181ST -- 6.7.17 PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED -- SENT TO 181ST -- 6.7.17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.