Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randall County, Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Fuqua Real Estate Investments. A Texas General Partnership, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT/STATEMENT OF DISTRIBUTION ~ from RCSO on fees on tax case from RCTO. ~ from RCSO on fees on tax case from RCTO. |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Filed Order of Sale | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ FUQUA REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS. a Texas General Partnership Served 04/09/2018 | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTION | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SHERIFF SALE SHERIFF SALE |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUED ORDER OF SALE | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST OS REQUEST PACKET OS REQUEST PACKET |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY JUDGMENT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.