Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randall County, Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Spencer Ken Ind Dba Data Central & 6Th Street Collectibles, Groom Bancshares Inc., City Of Amarillo, Barrington Broadcasting Texas Corporation Dba Kvii Televeision #379, represented by Leslie Spear Schmidt, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | TAX CASE (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT 3 EXHIBIT 3 |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Value from Tax Office EXHIBIT 2 EXHIBIT 2 |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification of Delinquent Tax Records EXHIBIT 1 EXHIBIT 1 |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (OCA) SIGNED ON 11/01/2018 3 PGS SIGNED ON 11/01/2018 3 PGS |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
GENERAL DENIAL - of CITY OF AMARILLO/Leslie Spear Schmidt, Attorney - of CITY OF AMARILLO/Leslie Spear Schmidt, Attorney |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED GROOM BANCSHARES 2.15.18 -- CARSON CO $100 GROOM BANCSHARES 2.15.18 -- CARSON CO $100 |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED BARRINGTON 2.13.18 -- TRAVIS CO #5 -- $75 BARRINGTON 2.13.18 -- TRAVIS CO #5 -- $75 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.